GA SB436 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to retirement and pensions, so as to repeal certain obsolete and inoperative provisions from such title; to provide a statement of intent; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Retirement; repeal certain obsolete and inoperative provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Heath [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #610 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-04 | Act 681 | |
2010-06-04 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-12 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-12 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-31 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-30 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-26 | House First Readers | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Read and Referred |