GA SB436 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 405
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 405
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 9 of Title 15 of the O.C.G.A., relating to probate courts, so as to change and modernize certain general provisions for probate courts; to amend Code Section 1-3-1, relating to construction of statutes generally, so as to conform a cross-reference; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Probate Courts; general provisions; change and modernize
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #787 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Vote #703 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #542 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Vote #703 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #542 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Act 405 | |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2018-03-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |