GA SB441 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to imposition, rate, computation, and exemptions from state income tax, so as to provide that all expenditures of a production company's state certified productions may be combined to meet spending thresholds; to lower spending thresholds; to increase the value of the tax credit; to lower the cap on credits for certain years; to provide for transferability of the tax credit; to provide for conditions and limitations; to revise definitions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Income Tax; all expenditures of a production company's state certified productions may be combined to meet spending thresholds; provide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Hopper |