GA SB454 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 2 of Chapter 12 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to bingo, so as to define certain terms; to provide that certain veterans organizations may sell certain pull tab games of chance; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Bingo; define certain terms; provide certain veterans organizations may sell certain pull tab games of chance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #906 - Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #616 - Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #616 - Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-26 | Act 468 | |
2010-05-26 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | House Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-29 | House Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-29 | House Insists | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Disagrees House Amend/Sub | |
2010-04-27 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-27 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-30 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-26 | House First Readers | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-08 | Senate Read and Referred |