GA SB462 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 7 of the O.C.G.A., relating to banking and finance, so as to transfer duties, powers, responsibilities, and other authority relative to industrial loans from the Industrial Loan Commissioner to the Department of Banking and Finance; to change the name of such loans to installment loans; to revise a short title; to provide for definitions; to provide for procedures, conditions, and limitations relative to issuing installment loans; to provide for exemptions; to provide for powers and duties relative to the department; to amend the O.C.G.A., so as to conform cross-references; to provide for a purpose; to provide for related matters; to provide for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Banking and Finance; duties, powers, and responsibilities relative to industrial loans from the Industrial Loans Commissioner to Department of Banking and Finance; transfer

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #727 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - House - House Vote #675 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #559 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30 Effective Date
2020-06-30 Act 409
2020-06-30SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2020-06-25SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2020-06-24SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2020-06-19HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-06-19HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-06-17HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-03-12HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-03-10HouseHouse First Readers
2020-03-09SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-03-09SenateSenate Third Read
2020-03-05SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-03-04SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-03-02SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-02-28SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback