GA SB477 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 17-4-20.1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to investigation of family violence, preparation of written report, review of report by defendant arrested for family violence, and compilation of statistics, so as to revise the terminology used in determining whom to arrest; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Investigation of Family Violence; terminology used in determining whom to arrest; revise
Sponsors
Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Sen. Harold Jones [D] | Rep. Bonnie Rich [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #723 (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #615 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #615 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-05 | Act 578 | |
2020-08-05 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-23 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Hopper |