GA SB480 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-15 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-15 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 2 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state administrative organization, so as to authorize compensation to be paid from sales and use tax collections on a contingency basis with respect to services that assist the Department of Revenue in the identification of taxpayers that are noncompliant with sales and use taxes; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Administrative Organization; compensation to be paid from sales and use tax collections on a contingency basis; authorize
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #594 (Y: 34 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #610 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #610 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Hopper |