GA SB489 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - House Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - House Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to lighting equipment of motor vehicles, so as to repeal provisions requiring an amber strobe light upon low-speed vehicles; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Lighting Equipment of Motor Vehicles; requiring an amber strobe light upon low-speed vehicles; provisions; repeal
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] |
Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #611 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #611 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-24 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-23 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-22 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-20 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-19 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Hopper |