GA SB5 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to repeal an Act creating the Lincoln County Recreation Authority, approved April 29, 1997 (Ga. L.1997, p. 4566); to provide for the assets and liabilities thereof; to provide for related matters; to provide a specific repealer; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Lincoln County Recreation Authority; repeal
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Anderson [R] | Rep. Tom McCall [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - House Vote #80 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Vote #13 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Vote #13 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-06 | Act 190 | |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-02-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |