GA SB506 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for a homestead exemption from City of Buford ad valorem taxes for municipal purposes in an amount equal to the amount by which the current year assessed value of that homestead exceeds the base year assessed value of that homestead; to provide for definitions; to specify the terms and conditions of the exemption and the procedures relating thereto; to provide for applicability; to provide for related matters; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Buford; ad valorem taxes for municipal purposes; homestead exemption; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - House - House Vote #759 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-06-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #663 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #663 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 396 | |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-06-22 | House | House First Readers |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Hopper |