GA SB512 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create the Central State Hospital Local Redevelopment Authority, approved February 29, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 3837), so as revise how members of the authority are appointed; to reduce the size of the authority; to revise the selection process and terms of officers of the authority; to terminate the terms of the current authority members; to further provide for the use of revenues generated by the authority; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Central State Hospital Local Redevelopment Authority; members of the authority are appointed; revise
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - House - House Vote #692 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #650 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #650 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 369 | |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-06-19 | House | House First Readers |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |