GA SB533 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a new charter for the City of Fort Valley, approved August 22, 1907 (Ga. L. 1907, p. 651), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 6, 2019 (Ga. L. 2019, p. 4170), so as to provide for vacancies on the Fort Valley Utility Commission; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Fort Valley; vacancies on the Fort Valley Utility Commission; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #719 (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-06-24 | House | House First Readers |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate Hopper |