GA SB6 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 5 of Title 42 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding correctional institutions of the state and counties, so as to prohibit the use of unmanned aircraft systems to deliver or attempt to deliver contraband to a place of incarceration; to prohibit the use of unmanned aircraft systems to photograph any place of incarceration without permission of the warden or superintendent of such place of incarceration; to provide for penalties; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Correctional Institutions of the State and Counties; use of unmanned aircraft systems to deliver or attempt to deliver contraband to a place of incarceration; prohibit
Sponsors
Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] |
Sen. Chuck Payne [R] | Sen. Sally Harrell [D] | Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #323 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #315 (Y: 166 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #27 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #315 (Y: 166 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #27 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-28 | Act 67 | |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-21 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |