GA SB60 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 15 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to miscellaneous provisions under the "Quality Basic Education Act," so as to provide for guidelines and other relevant materials to inform high school students participating in interscholastic athletic activities about the nature and warning signs of sudden cardiac arrest; to provide for definitions; to provide for informational meetings; to provide for removal from an athletic activity under certain circumstances and to establish return to play policies; to require annual review by coaches; to provide for limited liability; to provide a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Jeremy Nelson and Nick Blakely Sudden Cardiac Arrest Prevention Act"
Sponsors
Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] | Rep. Bonnie Rich [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #349 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Vote #279 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #95 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Vote #279 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #95 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-02 | Act 136 | |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-03-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hopper |