GA SB65 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5C of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to alternative ad valorem tax on motor vehicles, so as to provide that the transfer of a title between legal entities owned by the same person does not constitute a taxable event; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alternative Ad Valorem Tax on Motor Vehicles; transfer of a title between legal entities owned by the same person; not constitute a taxable event; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #306 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Vote #302 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #68 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-01 Effective Date
2019-05-07 Act 300
2019-05-07SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2019-03-28SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2019-03-26HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-26HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-28HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-27SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-02-27SenateSenate Third Read
2019-02-27SenateSenate Engrossed
2019-02-25SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-02-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-07SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-06SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback