GA SB73 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 15-18-80 and Article 4 of Chapter 17 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to policy and procedure relative to pretrial intervention and diversion programs and revenues collected from fines and fees relative to the Peace Officers' Annuity and Benefit Fund, respectively, so as to provide that payments to the Peace Officers' Annuity and Benefit Fund from fees collected in criminal and quasi-criminal cases prior to adjudication of guilt shall be deducted and remitted by the clerk of court directly to the secretary-treasurer of such fund; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Peace Officers' Annuity and Benefit Fund; fees collected in criminal and quasi-criminal cases prior to adjudication of guilt; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Vote #236 (Y: 159 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #57 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #57 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 257 | |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hopper |