GA SB77 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state flag, seal, and other symbols, so as to provide additional protections for government statues, monuments, plaques, banners, and other commemorative symbols; to provide definitions; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Flag, Seal, and other Symbols; additional protections for government statues; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] |
Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #350 (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #321 (Y: 100 N: 71 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #118 (Y: 21 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #119 (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #321 (Y: 100 N: 71 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #118 (Y: 21 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #119 (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-26 | Act 57 | |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hopper |