GA SB79 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 32-6-75 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to restrictions on outdoor advertising authorized by Code Sections 32-6-72 and 32-6-73 and multiple message signs on the interstate system, primary highways, and other highways, so as to remove references to the term "mechanical" in relation to multiple message signs; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Outdoor Advertising; references to the term "mechanical" in relation to multiple message signs; remove
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Sen. Gloria Butler [D] |
Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #325 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Vote #303 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #40 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Vote #303 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #40 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-26 | Act 54 | |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-03-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hopper |