GA SB8 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-23 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-23 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance, so as to provide for consumer protections regarding health insurance; to provide for definitions; to provide for disclosure requirements of providers, hospitals, and insurers; to provide for billing and reimbursement of out-of-network services; to provide for procedures for dispute resolution for surprise bills for nonemergency services; to provide for payment of emergency services; to provide for an out-of-network reimbursement rate workgroup; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Surprise Billing and Consumer Protection Act"; health insurance; provide consumer protections; definitions
Sponsors
Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] | Sen. Gloria Butler [D] |
Sen. Nan Orrock [D] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - House - House Vote #762 (Y: 92 N: 63 NV: 6 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #94 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #94 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-21 | House | House Postponed |
2018-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-30 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-03-24 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-03-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-27 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
2016-11-15 | Senate | Senate Prefiled |