GA SB83 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to competencies and core curriculum relative to quality basic education, so as to revise provisions relating to elective courses in History and Literature of the Old and New Testament Eras; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Quality Basic Education; elective courses in History and Literature of the Old and New Testament Eras; provisions; revise
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #378 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Vote #300 (Y: 122 N: 44 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #96 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Vote #300 (Y: 122 N: 44 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #96 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-06 | Act 229 | |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-03-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hopper |