GA SB99 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 27-2-2 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to issuance and sale of hunting, fishing, and trapping licenses, so as to provide that applications processed through the Department of Natural Resources' online licensing system allow applicants to make an anatomical gift; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for education regarding anatomical gifts; to authorize the Department of Natural Resources to share donor information with organ procurement organizations; to provide for applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Department of Natural Resources' Online Licensing System; allow applicants to make an anatomical gift; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. David Lucas [D] | Sen. Zahra Karinshak [D] |
Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Rep. Vance Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Vote #230 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #50 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #50 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 265 | |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-25 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hopper |