GA SR114 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging congress to pass funding legislation that will secure the southern border of the United States; and for other purposes.
Title
United States Congress; pass funding legislation; secure southern border; urge
Sponsors
Sen. William Ligon [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #399 (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/54722 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/180750 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/54722#17289 |