GA SR19 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Georgia Commission on Freight and Logistics; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Commission on Freight and Logistics; create
Sponsors
Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - House - House Vote #698 (Y: 151 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Vote #19 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Vote #19 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-20 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2020-06-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-06-18 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-29 | House | House Postponed |
2019-03-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Senate Hopper |