GA SR193 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Senate Study Committee on Transferring Oversight of Developmental Disabilities to the Department of Community Health; and for other purposes.
Title
Senate Study Committee on Transferring Oversight of Developmental Disabilities to the Department of Community Health; create
Sponsors
Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |