GA SR305 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION condemning the failure of the United States Senate to pass the Born Alive Abortion Survivors Protection Act; and for other purposes.
Title
US Senate; failure to pass the Born Alive Abortion Survivors Protection Act; condemn
Sponsors
Sen. William Ligon [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] | Sen. Ellis Black [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/55735 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/184007 |