GA SR325 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Senate Study Committee on Portable Benefits for Independent Workers; and for other purposes.
Title
Senate Study Committee on Portable Benefits for Independent Workers; create
Sponsors
Sen. Elena Parent [D] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] |
Sen. Nikema Williams [D] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/55835 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/184371 |