GA SR433 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION creating the Senate Reducing Georgia's Cost of Doing Business Study Committee; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Reducing Georgia's Cost of Doing Business Study Committee; create

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-04-02SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-26SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-25SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-22SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-21SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback