GA SR470 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Senate Study Committee on Music Workforce Development; and for other purposes.
Title
Senate Study Committee on Music Workforce Development; create
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |