GA SR601 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION recognizing and commending Donald Trump, President of the United States, for his Phase 1 Trade Deal with China; and for other purposes.
Title
Trump, Donald; President of the United States; recognize
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Marty Harbin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/56899 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/188461 |