GA SR717 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION recognizing and commending Donald Trump, President of the United States, for the new North American Free Trade agreement; and for other purposes.
Title
Trump, Donald; President of the United States; new North American Free Trade agreement; recognize
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. John Wilkinson [R] |
Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57258 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/189540 |