GA SR818 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Georgia so as to clarify that only citizens of the United States shall have a right to vote in elections in this state; to provide for related matters; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
Right to Register and Vote; only citizens of the United States shall have a right to vote in elections; clarify- CA
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Dolezal [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #613 (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #614 (Y: 33 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #613 (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #614 (Y: 33 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Lost |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Hopper |