HI HB1001 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1001
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Human Services to use an integrated and multigenerational approach to delivering human services to reduce the incidence of intergenerational poverty and dependence on public benefits.
Title
Relating To Poverty.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1001 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 6
SB1227 (Same As) 2019-04-23 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 954).
SB1227 (Same As) 2019-04-23 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 954).
Subjects
Department of Human Services
Integrated and Multigenerational Approach
Reduction of Intergenerational Poverty
Integrated and Multigenerational Approach
Reduction of Intergenerational Poverty
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1001&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1001_.HTM |