HI HB1005 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1005
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the spouse and child abuse special fund from the central services assessment and administrative expense assessment. Amends the spouse and child abuse special fund to allow reimbursements received from the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Administration for Children and Families, in the year following the fiscal year in which the Title IV-E funds were expended, to be deposited and expended for state-funded share of spouse or child abuse and neglect prevention, intervention, and other related services. Replaces "account" with "fund," and deletes "department of human services" from the title.
Title
Relating To The Spouse And Child Abuse Special Fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1005 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 6
SB1231 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 084, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1185).
SB1231 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 084, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1185).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1005&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1005_.HTM |