HI HB1006 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1006
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Corrects an error in Act 176, Session Laws of Hawaii 2018; clarifies that section 350-2(f), Hawaii Revised Statutes, applies to exempt child care facilities.
Title
Relating To Child Safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1006 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 6
SB1232 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 085, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1186).
SB1232 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 085, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1186).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1006&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1006_.HTM |