HI HB1007 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 086, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1187).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allow participants to make both pre-tax contributions and post-tax contributions to the State Deferred Compensation Plan. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Adding The Roth Option For The Deferred Compensation Plan.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateAct 086, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1187).
2019-06-12HouseAct 086, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1187).
2019-05-03HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-03SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 887).
2019-05-02HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
2019-05-02HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 886).
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 881).
2019-04-30HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-11-19.
2019-04-30HouseHouse Conferee(s) discharged.
2019-04-23SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 850).
2019-04-23SenateReceived notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 847).
2019-04-23HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Cullen Chair; Eli, McDermott.
2019-04-22HouseHouse Conferee(s) discharged.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Cullen Chair; Eli, McDermott.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 813) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05SenateOne Day Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1997) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-05SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye, Taniguchi.
2019-04-04SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-19 10:05AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-21SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-21SenateReported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1357) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 3:00PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to LCA, WAM.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 91).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-20HousePassed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno, Nakamura, Onishi excused (3).
2019-02-20HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 804), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-06HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
2019-02-04HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1233 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback