HI HB1009 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Act 154, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1256).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a movie theater to provide at least two showings per week per movie offered with open movie captioning. Removes the option for a movie theater to provide eyewear to fulfill the open movie captioning requirement. Makes the open captioning requirement permanent by repealing the sunset date of Act 39, Session Laws of Hawaii 2015. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Movie Theaters.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01SenateAct 154, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1256).
2019-07-01HouseAct 154, on 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1256).
2019-05-03HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-03SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 887).
2019-05-02HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
2019-05-02HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 886).
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 881).
2019-04-30HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-11-19.
2019-04-30HouseHouse Conferee(s) discharged.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Johanson, C. Lee, Cullen Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 814) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) S. Chang . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05SenateOne Day Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1900) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-02SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-02-19 10:10AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2019-03-22SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1424) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) S. Chang ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen, Fevella.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to CPH, JDC.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 245).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1116), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-27HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2019-02-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-27-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 496), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-02-13HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Morikawa.
2019-02-11HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-11HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-11-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
2019-02-08HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 159) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-02-05HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Quinlan, Yamashita.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1235 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to CPH, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback