HI HB1022 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1022
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an income tax credit for qualifying small businesses to offset the increase in the minimum hourly rate that employers must pay employees, and increases the minimum wage each year from 2020 through 2024.
Title
Relating To Minimum Wage.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1022 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
SB1248 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
SB1248 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1022&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1022_.HTM |