HI HB1037 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1037
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - Re-referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 10
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - Re-referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 10
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Updates section 329-38(i), Hawaii Revised Statutes, to be consistent with federal law under Title 21 of the Code of Federal Regulations to allow for the use of either words or figures, not both, to indicate quantity where electronic prescriptions are permitted.
Title
Relating To The Uniform Controlled Substances Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | House | Re-referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 10 |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1037 (Carry Over) 2019-02-01 - Re-referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 10
SB1263 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 095, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1196).
SB1263 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 095, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1196).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1037&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1037_.HTM |