HI HB1043 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1043
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 2:00PM in conference room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 2:00PM in conference room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Replaces the tax boards of review with a single tax appeal review panel comprised of members who shall devote full time to their duties. Amends the grounds upon which an appeal to the administrative appeals and dispute resolution program may be made by disallowing appeals of proposed assessments. Allows any person who has already filed an appeal with a board of review to continue or withdraw their appeal and refile their appeal with the tax appeal review panel until 1/1/2021, at which point all remaining appeals before a board of review automatically transfer to the tax appeal review panel. Makes an appropriation. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Tax Appeals.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2019-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 2:30PM in conference room 309. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Cullen Chair; Eli, McDermott. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 821) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2013) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-19 10:35AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1376) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 440). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima excused (2). |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1161) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1043 (Carry Over) 2019-04-24 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 2:00PM in conference room 309.
SB1269 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB1269 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Administrative Appeals and Dispute Resolution Program
Appropriation ($)
Tax Appeal Review Panel
Tax Appeals
Appropriation ($)
Tax Appeal Review Panel
Tax Appeals