HI HB1045 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1045
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that tax refund offsets may be performed by the Department of Accounting and General Services and the Department of Taxation.
Title
Relating To Tax Refund Offsets.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 95). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno, Nakamura, Onishi excused (3). |
2019-02-20 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 807), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1045 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - Referred to WAM.
SB1271 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 097, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1198).
SB1271 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 097, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1198).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1045&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1045_.HTM |