HI HB1050 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 243, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1352).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 243, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1352).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates the Department of Agriculture to perform specified tasks to address the interisland spread of invasive species. Requires annual report. Requires the Auditor to audit the Plant Quarantine Branch. Makes appropriations. (HB1050 CD1)
Title
Invasive Species; Interisland Movement; Department of Agriculture; Audit; Appropriations ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | House | Act 243, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1352). |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Act 243, 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1352). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 107-16). |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 107-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Riviere, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom. |
2016-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-16 at 3:45PM in Conference Room 224. |
2016-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 11:30AM in conference room 224. |
2016-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 4:10PM in conference room 224. |
2016-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-16 4:10PM in conference room 224. |
2016-04-25 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-26-16 4:10PM in conference room 224. |
2016-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 687). |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Gabbard, Riviere Co-Chairs; L. Thielen, Slom. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tsuji, Onishi Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 510) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3590) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye, Slom. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-30-16 9:20AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | The committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 03-31-16 9:20AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-31-16 9:20AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-16 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Reported from EET/WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3019) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Espero, Galuteria, Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Keith-Agaran. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-16 1:45PM in conference room 414. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET/WLA, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to ENE/AGL, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 100). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 649), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-26-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1). |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 275), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-12 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Tokioka, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-11 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 02-12-15 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-27 | House | Pending introduction. |