HI HB1051 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1051
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the law relating to registration renewals and initial registrations of motor carrier vehicles of any motor carrier who has an outstanding federal out-of-service order.
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicle Registration.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1051 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 6
SB1277 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3).
SB1277 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1051&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1051_.HTM |