HI HB1059 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 279, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the court to advise a criminal defendant of the effects of a guilty or no contest plea on alien status in certain criminal proceedings at the commencement of arraignment and plea hearings and prior to the commencement of trial. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Court Advisement of Aliens; Guilty Plea; Admission to United States

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateBecame law without the Governor's signature, Act 279, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1385).
2013-07-09HouseBecame law without the Governor's signature, Act 279, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1385).
2013-04-22HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2013-04-23SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 716).
2013-04-22HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll excused (1).
2013-04-22HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2013-04-22SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 715).
2013-04-19HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13.
2013-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697).
2013-04-16SenateSenate Conferees appointed: English, Chair; Hee, Co-Chair(s); Slom.
2013-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
2013-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2013-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 551) in amended form (SD 2).
2013-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13.
2013-04-05SenateReported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1376) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2013-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-02SenateThe committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 04-03-13 3:00PM in conference room 016.
2013-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-13 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2013-03-21SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
2013-03-21SenateReported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 946) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL.
2013-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Gabbard, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon.
2013-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-13 1:17PM in conference room 224.
2013-03-07SenateReferred to TIA, JDL.
2013-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 317).
2013-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13.
2013-03-01HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 913) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-03-01HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Cabanilla, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Kawakami, McDermott, Thielen.
2013-02-26HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-01-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2013-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Har, Say excused (3).
2013-02-13HouseReported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 404) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2013-02-06HouseThe committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Cachola, McDermott.
2013-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 02-06-13 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
2013-01-28HouseReferred to VMI, JUD, referral sheet 6
2013-01-24HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2013-01-23HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback