HI HB1064 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1064
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a means for the EUTF to void claims for reimbursement of Medicare part B premiums or any other debt payable that totals less than a specified amount and is older than ten years. (HB1064 HD1)
Title
Relating To Unclaimed Property Of The Hawaii Employer-union Health Benefits Trust Fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2). |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 387) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-09-17 11:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1064 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2).
SB930 (Same As) 2017-07-11 - Act 144, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1245).
SB930 (Same As) 2017-07-11 - Act 144, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1245).