HI HB1066 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes solicitation of a minor for prostitution a crime. Adds the offenses of solicitation of a minor for prostitution, habitual solicitation of prostitution, and solicitation of prostitution near schools and public parks to the State's forfeiture laws. Requires registration with the sexual offender registry for conviction of solicitation of a minor for prostitution. (HB1066 HD1)
Title
Prostitution; Minors; Offenses; Statute of Limitations; Forfeiture; Sex Offender Registry
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 318). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). |
2013-02-28 | House | Deferred one day Friday, 03-01-13. |
2013-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 730) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-26 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ito. |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-26-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-21 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-13 at 2:00pm. |
2013-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-21-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |