HI HB1068 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 245, 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1348).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 245, 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1348).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain employers to display a poster that provides specified information relating to human trafficking and the National Human Trafficking Resource Center hotline. Establishes penalties for violations of the poster requirement. (HB1068 CD1)
Title
National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] |
Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | Senate | Act 245, 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1348). |
2013-07-09 | House | Act 245, on 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1348). |
2013-05-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 121). |
2013-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 121) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Slom. |
2013-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, McKelvey, Cabanilla, Cachola, Carroll, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 3:00 PM in Conference Room 229. |
2013-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 10:45AM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 10:45AM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday, 04-24-13 at 2:10pm in Conference Room 229. |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 10:40AM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-19 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 10:40AM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Espero replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s). |
2013-04-18 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-19-13 10:30AM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 701). |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Chun Oakland, Chair; Hee, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Ihara, Slom. |
2013-04-16 | House | House conferee(s) added: Representative(s) Cabanilla. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Wooley, McKelvey Co-Chairs; Cachola, Carroll, Thielen. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 552) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1387) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-13 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported from HMS/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1010) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-21-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Referred to HMS/JDL, WAM. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 373). |
2013-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cullen, Fale, Hanohano, Hashem, Ichiyama, McKelvey, Takayama, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Coffman, Har, Ito, Jordan, Kawakami, McDermott, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka, Tsuji, Yamashita voting no (12) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Carroll, Cullen, Hashem, Ichiyama, Ito, Kawakami, Oshiro, Takayama, Tokioka, Tsuji, Ward, Yamashita voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Fale, Hanohano, Har, Jordan, McDermott voting no (6) and none excused (0). |
2013-03-01 | House | Deferred one day Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | House | Deferred one day Friday, 03-01-13. |
2013-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD/CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 720) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-11 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Brower, Carroll, Evans, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Cachola, Har, Ito, Thielen. |
2013-02-11 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Brower, Carroll, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Belatti, Cabanilla, Ito, Wooley, Thielen. |
2013-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD/CPC on Monday, 02-11-13 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to JUD/CPC, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |