HI HB1069 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-08 - Act 216, 07/07/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1317).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-08 - Act 216, 07/07/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1317).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and appropriates funds for HTDC to provide grants to businesses with a federal small business innovation research phase II or III award. (HB1069 CD1)
Title
Small Business Innovation Research Awards; Technology; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-08 | Senate | Act 216, 07/07/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1317). |
2015-07-08 | House | Act 216, on 07/07/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1317). |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 105). |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 105) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Kouchi, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Slom. |
2015-05-01 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Luke, Kong; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2015-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 10:00AM in conference room 423. |
2015-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-28-15 10:00AM in conference room 423. |
2015-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-24-15 10:00AM in conference room 423. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Kouchi Co-Chair; Dela Cruz, Tokuda, Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Kawakami, Luke Co-Chairs; Kong, Ward. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 598) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1486) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-15 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1163) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Baker, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | The committee on EDT will reconsider its previous decision made on 3/18/15 and will hold a public decision making on 03-25-15 2:50PM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Dela Cruz ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Chun Oakland, Harimoto. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-15 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to EDT, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 101). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 659), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-25-15 2:45PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto excused (2). |
2015-02-09 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 35) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-03 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ito. |
2015-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-03-15 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-27 | House | Pending introduction. |