HI HB1085 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1085
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Kauai to manage the deposit beverage container program within its jurisdiction as a pilot project for three years. (HB1085 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Deposit Beverage Container Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 222) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-02-07 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-07-19 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1085 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).