HI HB1095 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1095
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Agriculture for feral pig control. (HB1095 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Agriculture.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 704) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Onishi, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Okimoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-13-19 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1095 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
SB1150 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 10:01AM in conference room 224.
SB1150 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 10:01AM in conference room 224.