HI HB1103 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 2:00PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 2:00PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the assessment and collection of impact fees prior to the issuance of a water meter and requires that impact fees be collected in full before or upon issuance of the water meter. Effective 07/01/2050. (SD1)
Title
Impact Fees; Counties; Water Meter
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 2:00PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-22-13 2:00PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Kouchi discharged as conferee(s); Added as Co-Chair(s). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Ige discharged as (Co-) Chair; Added as conferee. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Baker, Kouchi, Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Evans, McKelvey Co-Chairs; Coffman, Kawakami, Cheape. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 554) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, Dela Cruz, English, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Solomon, L. Thielen, Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1378) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-13 9:10AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 942) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-13 2:55PM in conference room 224. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 324). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Har, McDermott voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 838), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-25 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Cabanilla, Cachola, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Carroll, Har, McDermott. |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled for decision-making on Monday, 02-25-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-20 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-13. |
2013-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-13 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har excused (2). |
2013-02-07 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 189) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2013-02-04 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Kawakami, C. Lee, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman, Hanohano. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 02-04-13 10:50AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB987 (Same As) 2013-04-18 - Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709).